HI SB11 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to EEP/EDB, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits restaurants from serving prepared foods using polystyrene foam containers statewide. Authorizes the Department of Health to adopt rules. Takes effect on December 31, 2020. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Polystyrene Foam Containers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseReferred to EEP/EDB, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 32) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Taniguchi. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 986) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee on CPH has rescheduled its decision making to 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH.
2019-02-14SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 322) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Fevella.
2019-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 1:45PM in conference room 224.
2019-01-17SenateReferred to AEN, CPH.
2019-01-17SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback