HI SB110 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB110
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and sets forth procedures for impounding a motor vehicle if a person operating the vehicle fails to display a valid insurance card.
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee on TRS deferred the measure. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/TRS, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TRS, WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB110 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
HB603 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to TRN, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 5
HB603 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to TRN, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=110&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB110_.HTM |