HI SB1105 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 666).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 666).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires any report of a study or an audit made by an executive department or agency, including the Hawaii health systems corporation, and by the legislative reference bureau, auditor, judiciary, or office of Hawaiian affairs, to be submitted to the clerk of each house, senate president, speaker of the house, chairs of the appropriate subject matter committee of each house, and the legislative reference bureau library. Requires a public hearing or informational briefing, except if waived by the senate president or speaker of the house of representatives. Excludes certain routine reports. (CD1)
Title
Legislative Hearings; Studies and Reports
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Gary Hooser [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Russell Kokubun [D] | Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] | Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 666). | |
2010-07-06 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 428). | |
2010-06-21 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-21-10 (Gov. Msg. No. 627) | |
2010-06-21 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 388) | |
2010-05-03 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Finnegan, Marumoto, Thielen voting no (3) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 72-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 72-10). | |
2010-04-19 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tokioka, Keith-Agaran, Evans, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-16 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2010-04-15 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-16-10 4:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Tokioka, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Evans, Pine. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 534). | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 533). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Taniguchi, Chair; Kim, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Deferred until 04-08-10. | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Deferred until 04-07-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Deferred until 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 298). | |
2010-03-31 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Finnegan voting no (1) and Representative(s) Chong, Morita, Souki excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1100-10), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Sagum, Finnegan. | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-17-10 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Sagum, Saiki, Takai excused (3). | |
2009-03-24 | (H) Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1178) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-03-16 | (H) The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tokioka, B. Oshiro, Chong, Evans; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Finnegan. | |
2009-03-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Monday, 03-16-09 2:00pm in House conference room 423. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 303) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 840) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2009-03-02 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hee, Hooser, Kidani, Tokuda, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Kokubun. | |
2009-02-26 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-09 9:30 AM in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-19 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-19 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 196) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Gabbard, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Bunda ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2009-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-09 9:30am in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to JGO, WAM. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |