HI SB1112 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1112
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for capital improvement projects and operating costs of the department of accounting and general services.
Title
Relating To The Department Of Accounting And General Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 3:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1112 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1112&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1112_.HTM |