HI SB1120 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Labor and Industrial Relations Appeals Board the option to provide notice of hearing by online posting on the board's webpage if service by first class mail fails to elicit a response from the party.
Title
Notice of Hearing; Labor and Industrial Relations Appeals Board
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 306). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 665) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-26-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB951 (Same As)
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1120&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB1120_.HTM |