HI SB1120 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the rate of real estate conveyance tax for condominiums and single family residences ineligible for a county home-owner's exemption with a value of at least $2,000,000. Amends the calculation for the amount of conveyance taxes to be deposited into the rental housing revolving fund. Exempts from conveyance taxes documents and instruments conveying real property subject to a government assistance program approved and certified by HHFDC and used for the provision of affordable housing for qualified persons in the State. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Conveyance Tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-14SenateReported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 319) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen.
2019-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 1:20PM in conference room 225.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to HOU, WAM.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback