HI SB1126 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Re-referred to WLH/EEP, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 31
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Beginning on November 1, 2019, requires all vulnerable coastal property sales or transfers to include a sea level rise hazard exposure statement to ensure that new property owners and transferees understand the special hazards, requirements, and limitations that may affect the property. Requires sellers to include whether property is within a sea level rise exposure area in the disclosure statement provided to the buyer. Takes effect 12/31/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Real Estate Disclosure.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12HouseRe-referred to WLH/EEP, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 31
2019-03-07HouseReferred to WLH/EEP, JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 369) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 988) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee on CPH has rescheduled its decision making to 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH.
2019-02-15SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 613) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH.
2019-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-13-19 1:20PM in conference room 229.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to WTL, CPH.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback