HI SB1145 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1145
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LCA, JDC.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LCA, JDC.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the party seeking judicial review shall bear the cost of preparing a transcript, except as provided by law, in which case the Board shall bear the cost of preparing the transcript.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Labor Relations Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to LCA, JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1145 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LCA, JDC.
HB914 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Act 212, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1314).
HB914 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Act 212, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1314).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1145&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1145_.HTM |