HI SB1150 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1150
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 10:01AM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 10:01AM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Agriculture for feral pig control. (SB1150 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Agriculture.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 10:01AM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 10:01AM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 10:01AM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826). |
2019-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Creagan, Cullen Co-Chairs; Okimoto. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 920). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; K. Kahele Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 774). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2142) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-19 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3). |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1424), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-15 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cachola, Onishi, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt. |
2019-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 03-15-19 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 377) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 926) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-12-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 57) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 1:20PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1150 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 10:01AM in conference room 224.
HB1095 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
HB1095 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).