HI SB1163 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1163
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Sunsets the renewable energy technologies income tax credit after 7/1/2045. (SB1163 HD1)
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1299) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LMG. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-12-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 381) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1186) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 663) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 3:15PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1163 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).