HI SB1175 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1175
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires registration of defendants who have had covered offenses dismissed due to mental or physical disease, disorder, or defect or have been involuntarily hospitalized in lieu of prosecution; clarifies and that criminal justice agencies may access registration information.
Title
Relating To Covered Offender Registration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-26-19 11:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-19 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1175 (Carry Over) 2019-02-26 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
HB948 (Same As) 2019-02-08 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB948 (Same As) 2019-02-08 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1175&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1175_.HTM |