HI SB1178 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1178
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends section 707-702(1), Hawaii Revised Statutes, to authorize manslaughter prosecutions for dangerous drug distribution that results in overdose deaths.
Title
Relating To Manslaughter.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-22-19 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-19 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1178 (Carry Over) 2019-02-22 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
HB951 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to JDC.
HB951 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1178&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1178_.HTM |