HI SB1205 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1205
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "dependent-beneficiary" and references to marriages in relation to civil unions.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund Compliance With Federal And State Laws.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee on LCA deferred the measure. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to LCA, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1205 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
HB979 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Referred to LCA, WAM.
HB979 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Referred to LCA, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1205&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1205_.HTM |