HI SB1214 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 285, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1391).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the commission on transportation. Prohibits any person or entity or the police from applying a wheel boot to a motor vehicle located on any public or private street, roadway, or highway, or on any public or private property. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parking Violations; Wheel Boots

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 285, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1391).
2013-07-09HouseBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 285, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1391).
2013-05-07SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Belatti, Cheape, Choy, Evans, Fale, Hanohano, Johanson, Jordan, McDermott, Thielen, Ward, Wooley voting no (12) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 13 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 12 No(es): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Espero, Gabbard, Green, Ihara, Kahele, Nishihara, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Solomon, L. Thielen, Slom. 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
2013-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 39) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 39).
2013-04-24HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Yamashita, Ichiyama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cheape.
2013-04-24SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Baker, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom.
2013-04-18HouseReceived notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).
2013-04-18SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 2:00PM in conference room 225.
2013-04-18SenateSenator(s) Espero replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s).
2013-04-17SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 2:00PM in conference room 225.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
2013-04-15HouseReceived notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 693).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Yamane, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Cheape.
2013-04-15SenateSenator(s) Baker added as Co-Chair(s).
2013-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
2013-04-15SenateSenate Conferees appointed: English, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Gabbard, Kouchi, Slom.
2013-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
2013-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2013-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 623).
2013-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13.
2013-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1537) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-03-28HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Woodson.
2013-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-13 3:15PM in House conference room 308.
2013-03-22HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3).
2013-03-22HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1145) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2013-03-20HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Ing, Nakashima, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Fukumoto.
2013-03-18HouseProposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-20-13 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
2013-03-07HouseReferred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 30
2013-03-07HousePass First Reading
2013-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 354) in amended form (SD 1).
2013-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
2013-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 614) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2013-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2013-02-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2013-02-06SenateReported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 103) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2013-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Gabbard, Kouchi, Slom.
2013-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-13 1:16PM in conference room 224.
2013-01-24SenateReferred to TIA, WAM.
2013-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB983 (Same As) 2013-03-05 - Referred to TIA, WAM.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback