HI SB1215 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1215
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Commissioner of Financial Institutions to modify requirements and make new requirements in chapter 454M, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to implement changes and improvements made to NLMS. Authorizes the Commissioner of Financial Institutions to issue cease and desist orders against licensees and unlicensed persons and to enter into consent orders.
Title
Relating To Mortgage Servicers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 191) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1215 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
HB989 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 075, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1176).
HB989 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 075, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1176).
Subjects
Administrative Proceeding
Cease and Desist
Chapter 91
Commissioner of Financial Institutions
Consent Order
Mortgage Servicers
NMLS
Rules
Unlicensed Persons
Violation
Cease and Desist
Chapter 91
Commissioner of Financial Institutions
Consent Order
Mortgage Servicers
NMLS
Rules
Unlicensed Persons
Violation
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1215&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1215_.HTM |