HI SB1219 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1219
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers personnel employment responsibilities, coordination duties, and emergency management reserve corps responsibilities from the director to the administrator. Amends county emergency operations plan requirements. Increases the maximum amount the governor may expend from the major disaster fund during a single emergency or disaster. Authorizes the administrator to pay emergency management reserve corps members for emergency response activities, rather than training only. Requires the Hawaii emergency management agency to prepare a comprehensive emergency plan, adopt standards for county emergency management plans, and recommend emergency prevention and mitigation measures related to building codes, zoning, and land use controls to the Legislature, among other requirements. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Emergency Management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 346) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1219 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB993 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 078, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1179).
HB993 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 078, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1179).
Subjects
Comprehensive Emergency Plan
Emergency Funding Authorization
Emergency Management Reserve Corps
Hawaii Emergency Management Agency
Emergency Funding Authorization
Emergency Management Reserve Corps
Hawaii Emergency Management Agency