HI SB1221 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 272, 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1378).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates $100,000 for fiscal year 2013-2014 for a Program Coordinator and technical support staff member for the proposed international flight training center and associated degree programs at the University of Hawaii at Hilo and Hawaii Community College. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; Aeronautical Training Programs; University of Hawaii ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateAct 272, 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1378).
2013-07-09HouseAct 272, on 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1378).
2013-05-07SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige.
2013-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 96).
2013-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
2013-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 96) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Nishimoto, Nakashima, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kidani, Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Slom.
2013-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 4:30PM in conference room 309.
2013-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 2:45PM in conference room 329.
2013-04-26HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 2:00PM in Conference Room 329.
2013-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 10:05AM in conference room 329.
2013-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 10:15AM in conference room 329.
2013-04-22HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 10:30AM in conference room 329.
2013-04-19HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 10:00AM in conference room 329.
2013-04-18HouseReceived notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).
2013-04-18HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 4:00PM in conference room 329.
2013-04-18SenateSenator(s) Kidani replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s).
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
2013-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 694).
2013-04-15SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Taniguchi, Chair; Espero, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Kahele, Slom.
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Choy, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Nakashima, Fale.
2013-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
2013-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2013-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 624).
2013-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice, Tuesday 04-09-13.
2013-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1516) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-04-01HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-03-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2013-03-20HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Choy, Hashem, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (6).
2013-03-20HouseReported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1034) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2013-03-12HouseThe committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hanohano, Nakashima, Ohno, Takai, Takumi, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cheape; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-12-13 2:10PM in House conference room 309.
2013-03-07HouseReferred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 30
2013-03-07HousePass First Reading
2013-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 355) in amended form (SD 2).
2013-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
2013-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 588) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2013-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi.
2013-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2013-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2013-02-15SenateReported from HRE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 408) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2013-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Tokuda, Slom.
2013-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom.
2013-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on HRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-13 2:00PM in conference room 224.
2013-01-28SenateReferred to HRE/PSM, WAM.
2013-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB725 (Same As) 2013-03-07 - Referred to HRE/PSM, WAM.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback