HI SB1223 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 080, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1181).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the sunset date of Act 141, Session Laws of Hawaii 2009, as amended, which requires each county to issue affordable housing credits to the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands, until July 1, 2024. Extends the sunset date of Act 98, Session Laws of Hawaii 2012, as amended, which requires the counties to issue affordable housing credits for each residential unit, or if allowed under the county's affordable housing program, vacant lot, developed by the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands, until July 1, 2024. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Affordable Housing On Hawaiian Home Lands.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateAct 080, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1181).
2019-06-12HouseAct 080, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1181).
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Nakamura, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 99) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 99).
2019-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, S. Chang, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-25-19 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 312.
2019-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 2:00PM in conference room 312.
2019-04-23HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 2:00PM in conference room 312.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 920).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; S. Chang, Riviere, Nishihara Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2019-04-18SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 813).
2019-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Todd Co-Chairs; McDermott.
2019-04-17HouseRe-referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 54
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 779).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakamura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3).
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2138) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-04-04HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakamura; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
2019-04-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-04-19 2:05PM in House conference room 308.
2019-04-02HouseRe-referred to FIN, referral sheet 48
2019-03-07HouseReferred to WLH/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 406) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from PSM/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 866) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani.
2019-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on PSM/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 11:30AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to PSM/WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from HWN/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 472) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to PSM/WAM.
2019-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella.
2019-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 02-13-19 1:18PM in conference room 016.
2019-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 02-13-19 3:15PM in conference room 414.
2019-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on HWN/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 2:46PM in conference room 016.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to HWN/HOU, PSM/WAM.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB997 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback