HI SB1226 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 083, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1184).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 083, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1184).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires criminal history record checks of adult relatives who provide care for a child whose family receives a child care subsidy from the Department of Human Services. Clarifies the role and response of the child care licensing program when it receives a report of death or injury of a child in a child care setting. Addresses the release of information pending an investigation. Increases penalties and clarifies that the Department of Human Services may take administrative and judicial action to enforce child care licensing requirements. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Child Care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | Senate | Act 083, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1184). |
2019-06-12 | House | Act 083, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1184). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 68) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 68). |
2019-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, C. Lee, Nakamura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 951). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Ruderman Chair; Baker, K. Rhoads Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura, C. Lee, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2019-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 694). |
2019-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-05-19. |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1986) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1680), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-21 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Yamane. |
2019-03-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-21-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4). |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1337), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-03-13 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 03-13-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 407) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1009) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/JDC. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 303) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/JDC. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS, CPH/JDC. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HMS, CPH/JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1000 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Subjects
Administrative and Judicial Action
Child Care
Criminal History Record Checks
Deficiencies and Complaints
Penalties
Records
Release of Information
Reports of Death or Injury
Child Care
Criminal History Record Checks
Deficiencies and Complaints
Penalties
Records
Release of Information
Reports of Death or Injury