HI SB1227 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 954).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Department of Human Services to use an integrated and multigenerational approach to delivering human services to reduce the incidence of intergenerational poverty and dependence on public benefits. (SB1227 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Poverty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 954).
2019-04-23SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Ruderman Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Ihara, Moriwaki, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Ward.
2019-04-05HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
2019-04-05SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-04SenateDeferred One Day 04-05-19.
2019-04-04SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 565).
2019-04-03HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-03HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1976), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-22HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1620) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-20HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 03-20-19 8:45AM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 408).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01SenateDeferred until 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateOne Day Notice 03-01-19.
2019-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading.
2019-02-28SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 675) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 3:00PM in conference room 016.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to HMS.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1001 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback