HI SB1231 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 084, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1185).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the name and purpose of the Spouse and Child Abuse Special Account to allow the Department of Human Services to retain federal reimbursements for expenditure of funds for child and spousal abuse prevention and intervention under Title IV-E of the Social Security Act, up to a specified maximum amount. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Spouse And Child Abuse Special Fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateAct 084, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1185).
2019-06-12HouseAct 084, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1185).
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 102) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 102).
2019-04-24HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tokioka.
2019-04-24SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Riviere, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 10:45AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-22HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 949).
2019-04-22SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Riviere, K. Rhoads Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Belatti, Tokioka, Ward.
2019-04-09HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
2019-04-09SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 696).
2019-04-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-03HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-05-19.
2019-04-03HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1989) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-20HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-20HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1452) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-15HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
2019-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 03-15-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 28
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 526).
2019-03-07SenatePassed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-05SenateOne Day Notice 03-07-19.
2019-03-05SenateWaived referral to JDC.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2019-02-15SenateReported from CPH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 451) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Riviere.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on CPH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to CPH/HMS, JDC.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1005 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback