HI SB1239 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1239
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to CPH/PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to CPH/PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the Director of Health to designate emergency departments to which persons requiring emergency mental health treatment may be taken by law enforcement.
Title
Relating To Involuntary Hospitalization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPH/PSM, JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1239 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to CPH/PSM, JDC.
HB1013 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 090, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1191).
HB1013 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 090, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1191).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1239&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1239_.HTM |