HI SB1241 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a deed restriction or covenant that requires a transferee of real property to pay a transfer fee to the person imposing the deed restriction or covenant, in connection with a transfer of real property. (SD2)
Title
Real Property; Covenants
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-04-07 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-04-06 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04/07/09 2:00 PM in conference room 325. | |
2009-04-02 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 04-07-09. | |
2009-03-31 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-02-09 3:45pm in conference room 325. | |
2009-03-27 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 04-02-09. | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-27-09 2:00pm in House conference room 325. | |
2009-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Saiki, Takai excused (3). | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1096), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2009-03-16 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Wakai, Cabanilla, Ito, Karamatsu, Luke, McKelvey, Mizuno, Souki, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Morita. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-16-09 2:15pm in House conference room 325. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 350) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 777) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2009-03-05 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Bunda, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. | |
2009-03-03 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO will hold a public decision making on 03-05-09 9:45 AM in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 237) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Green, Ihara, Sakamoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-09 8:30 AM in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to CPN, JGO. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Introduced. |