HI SB1241 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - (H) Act 100, on 6/9/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1203).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - (H) Act 100, on 6/9/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1203).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals conveyance tax exemption for low-income housing projects certified by the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation. Effective July 1, 2011. (SB1241 HD1)
Title
Conveyance Tax Exemption; Low-income Housing Development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | (H) Act 100, on 6/9/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1203). | |
2011-06-14 | (S) Act 100, 6/9/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1203). | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Ige. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) One Day Notice 04-20-11. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-20-11. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-11 in disagreeing to the House amendments. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Chang, Cabanilla, Har Co-Chairs; Chong, Riviere. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 514). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Fontaine, Johanson, Marumoto, Pine, Souki voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1480) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-11 3:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from WLO/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1149), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chong, Chang, Coffman, Har, Ito, Nakashima, Pine, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Cabanilla, Chong, Coffman, Ito, Nakashima, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, Riviere. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO/HSG on Wednesday, 03-23-11 10:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to WLO/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 282) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 635) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 403) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Shimabukuro, Slom. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to WLH, WAM. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1014 (Same As) 2011-01-26 - (H) Referred to WLO/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 2