HI SB1241 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1241
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes residency requirements for eligibility for public assistance and state low-income housing, includes exemptions to requirements under certain circumstances.
Title
Relating To Residency Requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 02-09-17 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-17 3:05PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HOU, WAM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1241 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1241&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB1241_.HTM |