HI SB1241 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 092, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1193).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to share energy data with the Department of Health for purposes of regulating greenhouse gas emissions. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Energy Data.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateAct 092, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1193).
2019-06-12HouseAct 092, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1193).
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 98) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 98).
2019-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Baker, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 4:34PM in conference room 224.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 4:34PM in conference room 224.
2019-04-22SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 4:34PM in conference room 224.
2019-04-22HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 949).
2019-04-22SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Baker, K. Rhoads Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Wildberger Co-Chairs; Tarnas, Thielen.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 780).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19.
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2152) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-29HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-20HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-20HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1458), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-14HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-03-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-14-19 8:35AM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-11HouseRe-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 29
2019-03-07HouseReferred to EEP/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 414) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 880) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2019-02-15SenateReported from EET/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 551) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Ruderman, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
2019-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on EET/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 414.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to EET/CPH, JDC.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1015 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback