HI SB1243 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1243
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State newborn hearing screening program to mandate reporting of diagnostic audiologic evaluation results, improve hearing follow-up of infants, and update definitions and terminology. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Newborn Hearing Screening.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 416) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 765) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman, Fevella. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-19 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1243 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27
HB1017 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1447 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
HB1017 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1447 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Referred to CPH, WAM.