HI SB1258 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires real estate appraisers, acting as arbitrators, to record arbitration awards, the records of the awards, if separately issued, and any supplementary, dissenting, or explanatory opinions with the bureau of conveyances within ninety days of the determination of the award and its notification to the parties. Effective 01/01/2112. (HD1)
Title
Real Estate Appraisers; Arbitration Awards; Recordation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | Senate | The conference committee deferred the measure. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 4:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 12:45PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 4:00PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-18-13 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-13 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: McKelvey, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Cachola, McDermott. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Galuteria, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 608). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Deferred until 04-11-13. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 471). |
2013-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Say, Tokioka excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1481), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1126) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-18 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Evans, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Ito; Noes: none; and 7 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, C. Lee, Tsuji, McDermott. |
2013-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-13. |
2013-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-13-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-11 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-13-13. |
2013-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-11-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 365) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 551) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-26-13 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-13 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB693 (Same As) 2013-02-08 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 02-11-13 3:30PM in conference room 325.