HI SB126 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds and positions to fulfill requests made by the Governor. Appropriates funds. (SB126 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The State Budget.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
2019-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 807).
2019-04-12HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Cullen, McDermott.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 725).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3).
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2136) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-04-04HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
2019-04-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-04-19 2:05PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-27HouseRe-referred to FIN, referral sheet 42
2019-03-21HouseThe committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-03-19HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-21-19 11:30AM in conference room 325.
2019-03-19HouseThe committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-19 11:30AM.
2019-03-14HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:55AM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-14HouseRe-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-07HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 50) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 896) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-28-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-01-22SenateReferred to WAM.
2019-01-18SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB964 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback