HI SB1271 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 097, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1198).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that tax refund offsets may be performed by the Department of Accounting and General Services and the Department of Taxation. (SB1271 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Tax Refund Offsets.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateAct 097, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1198).
2019-06-12HouseAct 097, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1198).
2019-05-03SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-04-26HouseReceived notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 964).
2019-04-26SenatePassed Final Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-25SenateOne Day Notice 04-26-19.
2019-04-25SenateSenate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-26-19.
2019-04-25SenateReconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
2019-04-24HouseReceived notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 960).
2019-04-24SenateSenate Conferees Discharged.
2019-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
2019-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 784).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3).
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2139) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-04-04HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
2019-04-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-04-19 2:05PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 429) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 677) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Moriwaki, Taniguchi.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to WAM.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1045 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback