HI SB1278 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1278
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies provisions on electric vehicle charging and parking.
Title
Relating To Electric Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee on TRS deferred the measure. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to TRS/EET, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1278 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
HB1052 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to EEP, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1052 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to EEP, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1278&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1278_.HTM |