HI SB1280 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 238, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1341).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 238, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1341).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist Kona SWAC, LLC, in constructing part of a seawater air conditioning district cooling system. (CD1)
Title
Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; Kona SWAC, LLC; Seawater Air Conditioning District Cooling System ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | House | Act 238, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1341). |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Act 238, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1341). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige. |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 135) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 135). |
2013-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Tokioka, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Kouchi, Ige, Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 11:00AM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 11:00AM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 11:00AM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-13 11:00AM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kouchi discharged as conferee(s); Added as Co-Chair(s). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Tsuji, Tokioka Co-Chairs; Ohno, Ward. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Gabbard, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Kahele, Kouchi, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 608). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Deferred until 04-11-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Deferred until 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 456). |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1421), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1117) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-19 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-18 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2013-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 03-19-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 371) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 741) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 116) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to ENE, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |