HI SB1288 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Act 014, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1115).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits a condominium board to direct the use of an electronic voting device at any condominium association meeting regardless of whether a secret ballot is used or required. Requires a condominium board to take reasonable steps to ensure secrecy and integrity of the votes, and that an audit trail be available after the meeting. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Condominium Voting.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateAct 014, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1115).
2019-04-24HouseAct 014, on 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1115).
2019-04-04SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-04-04SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 539).
2019-04-03HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-03HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1981), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-19HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3).
2019-03-19HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1399), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Belatti.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 436) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-28SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 757) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Nishihara.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1316 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback