HI SB1289 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires payors of non-wage payments for construction services to report the payments to the department of taxation. Establishes penalties for failure to report. Effective July 1, 2030. (SB1289 HD1)
Title
Taxation; Construction Services; Non-Wage Payments
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 309. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 1:30PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 3:00PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 3:00PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 3:00PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Luke Chair; Nishimoto, Woodson, Ward. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Ige, Chair; Kidani, Kouchi. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 630). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Choy, Fale, Har, Jordan, Say voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Say, Tokioka excused (2). |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1467) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-04-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-13 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-08 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 398) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-13. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 4 offered. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 625) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Kouchi, Tokuda. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-12-13 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-13 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |