HI SB1297 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1297
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an application for motor vehicle registration to include additional identifying information. Requires the counties to fine the legal or registered owner of an abandoned or derelict vehicle. Requires the legal or registered owner to have up-to-date motor vehicle registration and motor vehicle insurance prior to repossession of the abandoned vehicle. (SB1297 HD1)
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 10:25AM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 10:25AM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; K. Rhoads, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs; K. Kahele, Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, C. Lee, Hashimoto Co-Chairs; Gates, Thielen. |
2019-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-05-19. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 566). |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1982), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1572), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McKelvey, Yamane. |
2019-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-19. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4). |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1335) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-03-13 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 441) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1051) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from TRS/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 646) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, English, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-19 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRS/JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1297 (Carry Over) 2019-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 225.
HB1234 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
HB1234 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).