HI SB1309 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1309
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation to enter into ninety-nine-year leases of units in residential condominiums located on state lands.
Title
Relating To Leasehold Condominiums On Lands Controlled By The State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU/WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HOU/WTL, CPH/JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1309 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Leasehold Condominiums on Lands Controlled by the State
Leases
Leasehold Condominiums on Lands Controlled by the State
Leases
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1309&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1309_.HTM |