HI SB1310 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the individual housing accounts savings program, board, and administrative fund. Imposes a ten per cent penalty on certain distributions. Allows individual housing accounts for dependent children. Expands authorized uses of individual housing accounts. Appropriates funds. (SB1310 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Individual Housing Accounts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 1:00PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 1:00PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: S. Chang Chair; Kanuha, K. Rhoads Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Brower, San Buenaventura, Matayoshi Co-Chairs; Nakamura, Thielen.
2019-04-09HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
2019-04-09SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 703).
2019-04-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseDeferred one day 04-05-19.
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2102), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-28HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-21HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
2019-03-21HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1535), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Lowen, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McKelvey, Morikawa, Yamane.
2019-03-18HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-18HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-19.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-18-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
2019-03-15HouseReported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1386) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-03-14HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino.
2019-03-12HouseBill re-scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-14-19 10:35AM in conference room 423.
2019-03-12HouseThe committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-14-19 10:30AM.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-12-19 9:30AM in House conference room 423.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 444) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1152) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere.
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
2019-02-14SenateReported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 321) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC.
2019-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen.
2019-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 1:20PM in conference room 225.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to HOU, WAM/JDC.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback