HI SB1312 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Act 202, 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1303).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Act 202, 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1303).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $10,000,000 from the general revenues into the Emergency and Budget Reserve Fund in FY 2014-2015 to comply with article VII, section 6, of the Hawaii State Constitution, which requires, under certain economic conditions, that the legislature provide a tax credit to state taxpayers or make a deposit into one or more funds. (CD1)
Title
Emergency and Budget Reserve Fund; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | Act 202, 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1303). |
2015-07-06 | House | Act 202, on 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1303). |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tsuji excused (1). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 155) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 155). |
2015-05-01 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, DeCoite, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-27-15 3:05PM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; DeCoite, Ward. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; English, Galuteria, Riviere, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (4). |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1527) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-03-19 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-19-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 354) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 560) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Galuteria. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |