HI SB1314 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the research activity tax credit so that references to the base amount in section 41 of the Internal Revenue Code shall not apply, and credit for all qualified research expenses may be taken without regard to the amount of expenses for previous years. Transfers certification duties from the Department of Taxation to the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism, which shall identify to the Legislature taxpayers who apply for the tax credit. Establishes an annual aggregate cap of $5,000,000. Extends the research activity tax credit through 2024. Repeals the research activity tax credit on 12/31/2024. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Tax Credits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 133) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 133).
2019-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Cullen, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-19 3:45PM in conference room 309.
2019-04-23SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826).
2019-04-22HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Cullen, McDermott.
2019-04-22HouseRe-referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 56
2019-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
2019-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-05HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
2019-04-05SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 592).
2019-04-04HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-03HouseDeferred one day 04-04-19.
2019-04-01HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, McKelvey, Saiki, Todd excused (4).
2019-04-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1912) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-15HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
2019-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-15-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 445) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 900) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to WAM.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback