HI SB1321 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1321

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that failure to register a firearm within the required time period does not relieve the owner of the duty to register the firearm. Allows the owner of an unregistered firearm to register the firearm thereafter without penalty. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Firearms.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee on JDC deferred the measure.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-22-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-02-15SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 573) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1321 (Carry Over) 2019-02-22 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback