HI SB1327 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1327
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources, in collaboration with the county councilmember representing the south Maui residency area, Kihei Community Association, and Aha Moku O Kula Makai, to develop a master plan to expand public access to the shoreline in south Maui, particularly state-owned land. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Public Access To The Shoreline In South Maui.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from WTL/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 501) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL/PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1327 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
HB849 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB849 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1327&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1327_.HTM |