HI SB1328 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1328
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that if a proposed increase in the wholesale price of certain drugs would result in a 16% or more price increase over a 2year period, the drug manufacturer shall notify various drug insurance providers.
Title
Relating To Prescription Drugs.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-19-19 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 25). |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 767) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Nishihara. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1328 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB267 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 4:00PM in conference room 229.
HB267 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 4:00PM in conference room 229.
Subjects
Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Insurance Commissioner
Notification
Prescription Drugs
Price Increases
Insurance Commissioner
Notification
Prescription Drugs
Price Increases
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1328&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1328_.HTM |