HI SB1328 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1328
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that if a proposed increase in the wholesale price of certain drugs would result in a 16% or more price increase over a 2year period, the drug manufacturer shall notify various drug insurance providers.
Title
Relating To Prescription Drugs.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-19 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-19-19 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 25). |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 767) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Nishihara. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB267 (Same As) 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
SB1328 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB1328 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Insurance Commissioner
Notification
Prescription Drugs
Price Increases
Insurance Commissioner
Notification
Prescription Drugs
Price Increases