HI SB1331 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1331
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HOU/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HOU/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation to immediately initiate negotiations with the owners of the Front Street Apartments affordable housing project to acquire the property. Requires the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation to exercise its power of eminent domain if an agreement with the owners cannot be reached within a reasonable time. Requires report to Legislature. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Affordable Housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HOU/JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1331 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HOU/JDC, WAM.
HB543 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 098, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1199).
HB543 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 098, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1199).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1331&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1331_.HTM |