HI SB1339 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Act 144, 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1247).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Act 144, 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1247).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a state definition for a rural area for purposes of federal programs only so that certain areas that would not otherwise be considered rural pursuant to a federal definition will be eligible for federal funds designated for rural areas. (CD1)
Title
Rural Areas; Federal Programs
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-25 | Senate | Act 144, 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1247). |
2013-06-25 | House | Act 144, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1247). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 42) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 42). |
2013-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Kouchi, Nishihara, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ige, Slom. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kouchi discharged as conferee(s); Added as Co-Chair(s). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Belatti, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Carroll, Fukumoto. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Solomon, Chair; Ige, Nishihara, Co-Chair(s); Dela Cruz, Kouchi, Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1533) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Choy, Hashem, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (6). |
2013-03-20 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1049), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-13 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Jordan. |
2013-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-13-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 379) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 576) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 163) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AGL will hold a public decision making on 02-05-13 2:46PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AGL has rescheduled its public hearing to 01-31-13 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 2:00PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AGL, WAM. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |