HI SB134 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB134
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 160, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1269).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 160, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1269).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits smoking and tobacco use, including the use of electronic smoking devices, by any person on the premises of the University of Hawaii. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | House | Act 160, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1269). |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 160, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1269). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Nakamura, Say voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 51-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 51-18). |
2018-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, K. Kahele, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Tokuda. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 11:30AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-18 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 828). |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; K. Kahele, Taniguchi Co-Chairs; Nishihara, Tokuda. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, McKelvey, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2018-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 549). |
2018-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1954-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-04-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-28 | House | Re-referred to HHS/HED, JUD, referral sheet 49 |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from HHS/HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1408-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Kong, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Ing, Quinlan, Matsumoto. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS/HED on Wednesday, 03-21-18 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS/HED, LAB, referral sheet 1 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT/HED, LAB, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 87) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim, Riviere, Taniguchi, L. Thielen. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 634) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-27-17 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from CPH/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 180) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ihara. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 2:00PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to CPH/HRE, JDL. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB429 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS/LAB, HED, referral sheet 1
SB134 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to HLT/HED, LAB, referral sheet 27
SB134 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to HLT/HED, LAB, referral sheet 27