HI SB1342 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Chief Justice to study and analyze the national landscape of donative transfer statutes and suggest revisions to Hawaii's donative transfer law. (SB1342 CD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Probate Code.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-03SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 888).
2019-05-03HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 970).
2019-05-02SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Wildberger voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
2019-04-30Senate48 Hrs. Notice 05-02-19.
2019-04-30SenateReport filed.
2019-04-30SenateSeparated Committee Report.
2019-04-30SenateFloor amendment adopted as amended (CD 2).
2019-04-30SenateFloor Amendment No. 28 offered.
2019-04-30HouseFloor amendment adopted as amended CD 2 with none voting no and none excused.
2019-04-30HouseFloor Amendment No. 5 offered by Rep. Belatti.
2019-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 66) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 66).
2019-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morikawa, Thielen; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) San Buenaventura.
2019-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Kim, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 5:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 3:15PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 3:16PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-18SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-19 3:02PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-17SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-18-19 3:40PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-16SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-19 4:30PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: C. Lee Chair; Morikawa, San Buenaventura, Thielen.
2019-04-12HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 899).
2019-04-12SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Kim, Wakai, Fevella.
2019-04-09HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
2019-04-09SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 704).
2019-04-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseDeferred one day 04-05-19.
2019-04-02HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Saiki, Todd, Yamane excused (4).
2019-04-02HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1933) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-15HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey.
2019-03-14HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-15-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-14HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-19 at 2:00pm.
2019-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-14-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 452).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01SenateDeferred until 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateOne Day Notice 03-01-19.
2019-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading.
2019-02-28SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 773) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-19 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to JDC.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback