HI SB1348 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 247, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1349).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 247, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1349).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the intent of the Small Business Regulatory Review Board's powers when reviewing state and county administrative rules that impact small businesses. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Small Business Regulatory Review Board.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 247, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1349). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 247, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1349). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 105) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 105). |
2019-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, C. Lee, Kitagawa, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 12:49PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 12:49PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826). |
2019-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, C. Lee, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2019-04-22 | House | Re-referred to EDB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 56 |
2019-04-12 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 899). |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; K. Rhoads, Taniguchi Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 787). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2151), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto. |
2019-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-04-01 | House | Re-referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 45 |
2019-03-29 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-29-19 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-29-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1609) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-20-19 11:30AM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-15 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-19 11:30am. |
2019-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-15-19 11:30AM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-19 11:30am. |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 03-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to EDB, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 456) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1015) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 421) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EET, JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |