HI SB1349 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 270, 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1376).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Reenacts the tax credit for qualified research activities to apply to taxable years from 2013 to 2019. Adds, amends, and deletes definitions. Establishes new reporting requirements. Requires DBEDT to conduct studies to measure the effectiveness of the tax credit and submit reports to the legislature. ( CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High Technology; Research Activities; Tax Credit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateAct 270, 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1376).
2013-07-09HouseAct 270, on 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1376).
2013-05-07SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Coffman, Fale voting no (2) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
2013-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 131) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 131).
2013-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Wakai, Ige, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2013-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Luke, Choy, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-26HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 3:00pm in Conference Room 423.
2013-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 11:30AM in conference room 423.
2013-04-23HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 3:30PM in conference room 423.
2013-04-19HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-13 2:30PM in conference room 423.
2013-04-18HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 2:30PM in conference room 423.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Tsuji, Luke Co-Chairs; Choy, Ward.
2013-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
2013-04-15SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Dela Cruz, Chair; Wakai, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Kidani, Slom.
2013-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 608).
2013-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2013-04-09SenateDeferred until 04-11-13.
2013-04-05SenateDeferred until 04-09-13.
2013-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 458).
2013-04-04HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1422), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-03-28HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Woodson.
2013-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-13 3:15PM in House conference room 308.
2013-03-22HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3).
2013-03-22HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1116) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2013-03-19HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-03-18HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2013-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 03-19-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
2013-03-07HouseReferred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30
2013-03-07HousePass First Reading
2013-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 381) in amended form (SD 2).
2013-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House.
2013-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
2013-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 769) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2013-02-27SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Ruderman; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda.
2013-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-13 9:15AM in conference room 211.
2013-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-13 10:05AM in conference room 211.
2013-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2013-02-15SenateReported from EGH/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 433) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2013-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda.
2013-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Chun Oakland, English, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Wakai.
2013-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on TEC deferred the measure until 02-14-13 1:20PM in conference room 414.
2013-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on EGH deferred the measure until 02-13-13 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2013-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on TEC deferred the measure until 02-12-13 1:20PM in conference room 414.
2013-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on EGH/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-13 2:50PM in conference room 016.
2013-01-28SenateReferred to EGH/TEC, WAM.
2013-01-28SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback