HI SB1363 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to VMI, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Veterans, Military, & International Affairs, & Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to VMI, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Veterans, Military, & International Affairs, & Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes and designates the ukulele as the official auana musical instrument of the State. Establishes and designates the pahu as the official kahiko musical instrument of the State.
Title
Official Auana State Musical Instrument; Official Kahiko State Musical Instrument; Designation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to VMI, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 46). |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-06-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 611) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Tokuda. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-15 1:20PM in conference room 414. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to GVO. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1275 (Same As) 2015-04-09 - Act 006, on 4/9/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1106).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1363&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB1363_.HTM |